No. 21-309
Title:Southwest Airlines Co., Petitioner
v.
Latrice Saxon
Docketed:August 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3226)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2021Brief of respondent Latrice Saxon in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Reply of petitioner Southwest Airlines Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 10 2021Petition GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 18 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Southwest Airlines Co.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief of petitioner Southwest Airlines Co. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Southwest Airlines Co.
Melissa Anne SiebertShook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 4700
Chicago, IL 60606

masiebert@shb.com
312-704-7700
Party name: Southwest Airlines Co.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Dale Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler, PLLC
100 Pine Street, Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94111

jennifer@guptawessler.com
(415) 569-6979
Party name: Latrice Saxon
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation