No. 21-3
Title:Eric S. Schmitt, Attorney General of Missouri, et al., Petitioners
v.
Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2882, 19-3134)
   Decision Date:June 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 2, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Eric S. Schmitt, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Missouri, et al.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Eric S. Schmitt, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Missouri, et al.