No. 21-297
Title:Travis Croft, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6627)
   Decision Date:January 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bradley N. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bgarcia@omm.com
202-383-5160
Party name: Travis Croft
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States