No. 21-275
Title:Stars Interactive Holdings (IOM) Ltd., fka Amaya Group Holdings (IOM) Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Kentucky, ex rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary of the Governor's Executive Cabinet
Docketed:August 25, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2019-SC-0058-DG, 2019-SC-0209-DG)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 25, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021Motion of Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary of the Governor's Executive Cabinet for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Stars Interactive Holdings (IOM) Ltd., f/k/a Amaya Group Holdings (IOM) Ltd., and Rational Entertainment Enterprises Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP - New York, NY
350 Fifth Ave
63rd FL
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary of the Governor's Executive Cabinet
Other
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation