No. 21-273
Title:Buck Gene Brune, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11360)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Cody Lee Cofer
    Counsel of Record
Cofer Luster Law Firm, PC
300 Burnett Street, Suite 130
Fort Worth, TX 76102

ccofer@coferluster.com
6827773336
Party name: Buck Brune
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States