No. 21-27
Title:Arrow Highway Steel, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Robert Dubin
Docketed:July 9, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B303289)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 10, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Waiver of right of respondent Robert Dubin to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 30 2021Response Requested. (Due September 29, 2021)
Sep 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2021 to October 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2021.
Oct 27 2021Brief of Robert Dubin in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Schonbrun Seplow Harris Hoffman & Zeldes LLP
200 Pier Ave.
Suite 226
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: Arrow Highway Steel, INC.
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Almaraz
    Counsel of Record
Alpert, Barr & Grant, A Professional Law Corporation
15165 Ventura Blvd., Suite 200
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

dalmaraz@alpertbarr.com
818-827-5172
Party name: Robert Dubin
David M. AlmarazAlpert, Barr & Grant, APLC
15165 Ventura Blvd., Suite 200
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

dalmaraz@alpertbarr.com
818-881-5000
Party name: Robert Dubin