No. 21-268
Title:Coverall North America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Carlos Rivas
Docketed:August 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55140)
   Decision Date:January 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 18 2021Response Requested. (Due November 17, 2021)
Nov 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2021.
Nov 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Norman Mitchell Leon
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
444 W. Lake Street, Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60606

norman.leon@dlapiper.com
(312) 368-4000
Party name: Coverall North America, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Shannon Liss-Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston Street
Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

sliss@llrlaw.com
6179945800
Party name: Carlos Rivas
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Retail Federation