No. 21-267 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Garfield Broadnax, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:August 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-70014)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Craig Herzog
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

sherzog@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: James Garfield Broadnax
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin – Director, TDCJ-CID