No. 21-260
Title:Virgin America, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Julia Bernstein, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:August 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15382, 20-15186)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2021Letter of August 27, 2021 from counsel for petitioner received.
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Regional Airline Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Airlines for America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021Brief of respondents Julia Bernstein, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 06 2021Reply of petitioners Virgin America, Inc., and Alaska Airlines, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Rescheduled.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Virgin America, Inc., and Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Julia Bernstein, et al.
Other
Ross Warren Bergethon
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

rbergethon@law.ga.gov
(404) 458-3546
Party name: States of Georgia, et al.
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Airlines for America and International Air Transport Association
Sarah Pierce Wimberly
    Counsel of Record
FordHarrison LLP
271 17th Street, NW., Suite 1900
Atlanta, GA 30363

swimberly@fordharrison.com
404-888-3842
Party name: Regional Airline Association