No. 21-26
Title:Brittany Billetts, et al., Petitioners
v.
Mentor Worldwide LLC
Docketed:July 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-56398)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2021 to September 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 8, 2021.
Aug 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2021 to October 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 8, 2021.
Oct 08 2021Brief of respondent Mentor Worldwide LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anthony Anderson Benton Dogali
    Counsel of Record
Dogali Law Group, P.A.
19321 U.S. Highway 19 N., Suite 307
Clearwater, FL 33764

adogali@dogalilaw.com
813-289-0700
Party name: Brittany Billetts, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Dustin Bradley Rawlin
    Counsel of Record
Tucker Ellis LLP
950 Main Avenue
Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113

drawlin@tuckerellis.com
216-592-5000
Party name: Mentor Worldwide LLC