No. 21-258
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Donta Keith Davis
Docketed:August 23, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2019-420)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Waiver of right of respondent Donta K. Davis to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 21 2021Response Requested. (Due October 21, 2021)
Sep 22 2021Letter from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2021Brief of respondent Donta K. Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
John David Traynor Echols
    Counsel of Record
Tulsa County Public Defender's Office
423 S. Boulder Avenue
Ste. 300
Tulsa, OK 74103

defender@mac.com
918.269.3802
Party name: Donta K. Davis
Other
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation