No. 21-248
Title:Philip E. Berger, et al., Petitioners
v.
North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Docketed:August 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2273)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 22, 2021 to October 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 13, 2021.
Oct 13 2021Waiver of right of respondents North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021Brief of respondents Damon Circosta, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Oct 27 2021Reply of petitioners Philip E. Berger, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 24 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jan 10 2022Brief of petitioners Philip E. Berger, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Republican State Leadership Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Legislature filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Lawyers Democracy Fund and Rep. Rodney Davis filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jan 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Legislative Exchange Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Republican National Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Philip E. Berger, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: Damon Circosta, Stella Anderson, Jefferson Carmon III, Stacy Eggers IV, and Wyatt T. Tucker, Sr., in their official capacities as Chair, Secretary, and members of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Stephen Kent Wirth
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

stephen.wirth@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-6739
Party name: North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP
Other
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jlienhard@holtzmanvogel.com
15403418809
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

taylor@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Wisconsin Legislature
Richard Bryan Raile
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

rraile@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1711
Party name: Lawyers Democracy Fund and Rep. Rodney Davis
Brunn Wall Roysden III
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

beau.roysden@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Charles Robert Spies
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1825 Eye Street NW
STE 900
Washington, DC 20006

cspies@dickinsonwright.com
202-466-5964
Party name: Republican State Leadership Committee
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: American Legislative Exchange Council
David Alan Warrington
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue
Suite 402
Alexandria, VA 22314

david.warrington@kutakrock.com
(571) 400-2120
Party name: Republican National Committee