No. 21-234
Title:Kevin R. George, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:August 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1916)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2021 to October 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2021.
Sep 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Kevin R. George
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy