No. 21-221
Title:Blake Cretacci, Petitioner
v.
Joe Call, et al.
Docketed:August 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5669)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Blake Cretacci