No. 21-211
Title:Valueland Auto Sales, Inc., and Ron Benit, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:August 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3596)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2021 to October 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 13, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Damion Michael Clifford
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Clifford LLP
115 W. Main Street, 4th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

dclifford@arnlaw.com
614-460-1600
Party name: Valueland Auto Sales, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America