No. 21-210
Title:Wisconsin, Petitioner
v.
Mark D. Jensen
Docketed:August 13, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2018AP1952-CR)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Waiver of right of respondent Mark D. Jensen to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 15 2021Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2021)
Oct 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2021 to November 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Arthur Blimling
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 West Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

blimlingja@doj.state.wi.us
608-267-3519
Party name: State of Wisconsin
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrea Taylor Cornwall
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin State Public Defender
735 North Water Street, Suite 912
Milwaukee, WI 53202

cornwalla@opd.wi.gov
414-227-4805
Party name: Mark D. Jensen