No. 21-207
Title:Behrman Capital IV, L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee
Docketed:August 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-13537)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 14, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021Brief of respondent Thomas Reynolds, Trustee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 08 2021Reply of petitioners Behrman Capital IV, L.P., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Behrman Capital IV, L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bill D. Bensinger
    Counsel of Record
Christian & Small LLP
1800 Financial Center
505 North 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35203

bdbensinger@csattorneys.com
205-250-6626
Party name: Thomas Reynolds, Trustee