No. 21-202 | |
Title: | Mylan Laboratories Ltd., Petitioner v. Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V., et al. |
Docketed: | August 12, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2021-1071) |
Decision Date: | March 12, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 09 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 18 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2021 to October 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2021, for all respondents. |
Aug 25 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre in support of neither party filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 13 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 13 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 30 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2021 to November 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 01 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 2, 2021, for all respondents. |
Nov 02 2021 | Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 02 2021 | Brief of respondent Janssen Pharmaceutica NV in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 16 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021. |
Nov 16 2021 | Reply of petitioner Mylan Laboratories Ltd. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 23 2021 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022. |
Jan 18 2022 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Robert Thomas Smith Counsel of Record | Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP 2900 K Street NW Suite 200 Washington, DC 20007 robert.smith1@kattenlaw.com | 202-625-3616 |
Party name: Mylan Laboratories Ltd. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Andrew Hirshfeld | ||
Pratik Arvind Shah Counsel of Record | Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP 2001 K Street N.W. Washington, DC 20006 pshah@akingump.com | 202-887-4210 |
Party name: Janssen Pharmaceutica NV | ||
Other | ||
Jeremy Cooper Doerre Counsel of Record | Tillman Wright, PLLC 3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310 Charlotte, NC 28277 jdoerre@ti-law.com | 7042484883 |
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre | ||
Matthew S. Hellman Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Ave., NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 mhellman@jenner.com | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Suite 500E Washington, DC 20001-5369 donald.verrilli@mto.com | 202-220-1101 |
Party name: Intel Corporation |