No. 21-198
Title:Anthony W. Knights, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10083)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2021Amicus brief of Anthony W. Knights not accepted for filing. (September 02, 2021)
Aug 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Center on Race, Inequality, and the Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 10, 2021 to October 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2021.
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aliza Hochman Bloom
    Counsel of Record
New England School of Law
154 Stuart Street
Boston, MA 02116

aliza.hochman@aya.yale.edu
(781) 710-9741
Party name: Anthony W. Knights
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Deborah N. Archer
    Counsel of Record
Center on Race, Inequality, and the Law at New York University School of Law
139 MacDougal Street
New York, NY 10012

deborah.archer@nyu.edu
2129986882
Party name: Center on Race, Inequality, and the Law, et al.
Adeel Mohammad Bashir
    Counsel of Record
President, American Muslim Bar Association
Office of the Federal Public Defender, Middle District of Florida
400 N. Tampa Street, Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

adeel_bashir@fd.org
703-835-3929
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers