No. 21-196
Title:SNH SE Ashley River Tenant, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Thayer W. Arredondo, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hubert Whaley, Deceased
Docketed:August 11, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of South Carolina
   Case Numbers:(2019-001767)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021Waiver of right of respondent Thayer W. Arredondo to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 31 2021Response Requested. (Due September 30, 2021)
Sep 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: SNH SE Ashley River Tenant, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth Luke Connor
    Counsel of Record
Connor & Connor LLC
302 Park Avenue SE
Aiken, SC 29801

ken@theconnorfirm.com
8032260543
Party name: Thayer W. Arredondo