No. 21-195
Title:Belmora LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bayer Consumer Care AG, et al.
Docketed:August 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2183, 18-2232)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 10, 2021 to October 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Hispanic Medical Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Brief of respondents Bayer Consumer Care AG, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Reply of Belmora LLC, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
202-729-6337
Party name: Belmora LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Bayer Consumer Care AG, et al.
Other
Bruce L. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Miller Nash LLP
111 S.W. Fifth Avenue
Suite 3400
Portland, OR 97204-3699

bruce.campbell@millernash.com
(503) 224-5858
Party name: National Hispanic Medical Association