No. 21-194
Title:California Trucking Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California, et al.
Docketed:August 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55106, 20-55107)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 21, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2021Letter dated August 16, 2021 from counsel for petitioner received.
Aug 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 10, 2021 to October 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Aug 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Motor Freight Traffic Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Minnesota Trucking Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Western States Trucking Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Transportation Intermediaries Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Intermodal Association of North America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of 48 State Trucking Associations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Shipper Trade Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Brief of respondents Robert Bonta, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Brief of International Brotherhood of Teamsters in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2021Reply of petitioners California Trucking Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: California Trucking Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: Robert Bonta, et al.
Other
Marc S. Blubaugh
    Counsel of Record
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP
41 S. High Street
Suite 2600
Columbus, OH 43215

mblubaugh@beneschlaw.com
614-223-9382
Party name: Intermodal Association of North America
Marc S. Blubaugh
    Counsel of Record
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP
41 S. High Street
Suite 2600
Columbus, OH 43215

mblubaugh@beneschlaw.com
614-223-9382
Party name: Transportation Intermediaries Association, Inc.
Karyn A. Booth
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Hine LLP
1919 M Street NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20016

karyn.booth@thompsonhine.com
202-263-4108
Party name: American Chemistry Council; et al.
Paul Damien Cullen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Cullen Law Firm PLLC
1101 30th Street NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20007

pxc@cullenlaw.com
2029448600
Party name: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc.
Stephen A. DiTullio
    Counsel of Record
DeWitt Ross & Stevens S.C.
2 E. Mifflin Street
Suite 600
Madison, WI 53703

sad@dewittllp.com
608-252-9362
Party name: Minnesota Trucking Association
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Stacey Monica Leyton
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

sleyton@altshulerberzon.com
4154217151
Party name: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
703 838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc. and Truckload Carriers Association
Claire Louise Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Eisen & Shapiro
10028 Woodhill Road
Bethesda, MD 20817

claire@eisen-shapiro.com
301-469-8590
Party name: National Motor Freight Traffic Association, Inc.
Philip Albert Talmadge
    Counsel of Record
Talmadge/Fitzpatrick
2775 Harbor Avenue SW
Third Floor, Suite C
Seattle, WA 98126

phil@tal-fitzlaw.com
2065746661
Party name: 48 State trucking Associations
Patrick James Whalen
    Counsel of Record
Ellison, Whalen & Blackburn
1201 K Street, Ste. 1201
Sacramento, CA 95814

attorneys@ellisonlawoffices.com
9164482187
Party name: Western States Trucking Association, Inc.