No. 21-187
Title:Hamdi Mohamud, Petitioner
v.
Heather Weyker
Docketed:August 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3471)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2021 to October 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2021.
Sep 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Peter Schuck filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2021 to November 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 10, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Hamdi Mohamud
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: united states
Other
Sheldon Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Triggs, LLP
1230 Montana Avenue
Suite 201
Santa Monica, CA 90403

seisenberg@sullivantriggs.com
3104518300
Party name: Peter Schuck
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.