No. 21-184
Title:Kevin Byrd, Petitioner
v.
Ray Lamb
Docketed:August 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-20217)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Waiver of right of respondent Ray Lamb to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Peter Schuck.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Motion of Seth Stoughton for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (September 07, 2021) (corrected efiling submitted)
Sep 07 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Seth Stoughton.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 27 2021Response Requested. (Due October 27, 2021)
Sep 29 2021Letter by counsel for respondent, Ray Lamb received.
Blanket Consent
Oct 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 27, 2021 to November 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anna Aleksandrovna Bidwell
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Rd.
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

abidwell@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Kevin Byrd
Attorneys for Respondent
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mccotter@boydengrayassociates.com
202-706-5488
Party name: Ray Lamb
Ray Lamb10576 Fallow Lane
Conroe, TX 77303

gg24parknw117sp@yahoo.com
936-203-9782
Party name: Ray Lamb
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Seth Stoughton
Sheldon Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Triggs, LLP
1230 Montana Avenue
Suite 201
Santa Monica, CA 90403

seisenberg@sullivantriggs.com
3104518300
Party name: Peter Schuck
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.