No. 21-175
Title:P. Z., Petitioner
v.
New Jersey
Docketed:August 6, 2021
Lower Ct:Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division
   Case Numbers:(A-5083-18T2)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 12, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 29 2021Response Requested. (Due October 29, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Louis Phillip Nappen
    Counsel of Record
Evan F. Nappen Attorney at Law, P.C.
21 Throckmorton Avenue
Eatontown, NJ 07724

louis@evannappen.com
7323898888
Party name: P. Z.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alexis R. AgreBurlington County Prosecutor's Office
49 Rancocas Road, P. O. Box 6000
Mount Holly, NJ 08060

aagre@co.burlington.nj.us
609-265-5035
Party name: New Jersey