No. 21-171
Title:Joel Zupnik, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1916)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 26 2021Response Requested. (Due September 27, 2021)
Sep 22 2021Motion of United States for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Joel Zupnik
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States