No. 21-164
Title:Trustees of the New Life In Christ Church, Petitioner
v.
City of Fredericksburg, Virginia
Docketed:August 4, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(201156)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Brief of respondent City of Fredericksburg, Virginia in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Jewish Values filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Brief amici curiae of American Association of Christian Schools, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Brief amici curiae of The Assembly of Canonical Orthodox Bishops of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 22 2021Reply of petitioners Trustees of the New Life In Christ Church filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021Rescheduled.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 13 2021Rescheduled.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Trustees of the New Life In Christ Church
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven Ray Minor
    Counsel of Record
Elliott Lawson & Minor
230 Piedmont Avenue
Suite 300
Bristol, VA 24201

sminor@elliottlawson.com
2764668400
Party name: City of Fredericksburg, Virginia
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: The Assembly of Canonical Orthodox Bishops of the United States of America, et al.
Matthew Theodore Martens
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

matthew.martens@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Coalition for Jewish Values
Brett Robert Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Office of the Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

brett.nolan@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, et al.
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: American Association of Christian Schools and Association of Christian Schools International