No. 21-1599
Title:Hanna Karcho Polselli, et al., Petitioners
v.
Internal Revenue Service
Docketed:June 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1010)
   Decision Date:January 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 28, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 28, 2022 to August 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 29, 2022.
Jul 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Taxpayer Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 29, 2022 to September 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 29, 2022.
Sep 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2022 to October 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 27, 2022.
Oct 27 2022Brief of respondent Internal Revenue Service in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.
Nov 15 2022Reply of petitioners Hanna Karcho Polselli, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Hanna Karcho Polselli, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of the Treasury--Internal Revenue Service
Other
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: Center for Taxpayer Rights