No. 21-1598
Title:City of Anaheim, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Fermin Vincent Valenzuela, et al.
Docketed:June 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55372)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 30, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 28, 2022 to September 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 26, 2022.
Jul 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of Southern California Defense Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2022Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association and League of California Cities filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief of respondents Fermin Vincent Valenzuela, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 07 2022Reply of petitioners City of Anaheim, California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: City of Anaheim, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

kbc74@georgetown.edu
202-661-6728
Party name: Fermin Vincent Valenzuela, et al.
Other
Christopher David Hu
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
505 Sansome Street, Suite 375
San Francisco, CA 94111

chu@horvitzlevy.com
4154625600
Party name: Association of Southern California Defense Counsel
Steven Jeff Renick
    Counsel of Record
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, LLP
801 So. Figueroa Street, 15th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

sjr@manningllp.com
213-624-6900
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association and League of California Cities