No. 21-1596
Title:Kyle Ardoin, Louisiana Secretary of State, et al., Petitioners
v.
Press Robinson, et al.
Docketed:June 28, 2022
Linked with 21A814
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-30333)
   Decision Date:June 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2022Application (21A814) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed.
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Response to application (21A814) requested by Justice Alito, due 5 p.m. (EDT), June 23, 2022.
Jun 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Alabama and 12 other states.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 20 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Applicants filed by National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 22 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Members of U.S. House of Representatives from Louisiana.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2022Response to application from respondent Galmon filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2022Response to application from respondent Press Robinson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 24 2022Reply of applicant Kyle Ardoin, Louisiana Secretary of State, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 28 2022Application (21A814) referred to the Court.
Jun 28 2022Application (21A814) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s June 6, 2022 preliminary injunctions in No. 3:22-CV-211 and No. 3:22- CV-214 are stayed. In addition, the application for stay is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The case is held in abeyance pending this Court’s decision in Merrill, AL Sec. of State, et al. v. Milligan, Evan, et al. (No. 21-1086 and No. 21-1087) or further order of the Court. The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application for stay and dissent from the treatment of the application as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment and the granting of certiorari before judgment.
Jun 08 2023Letter requesting establishment of briefing and argument schedule in No. 21-1596 filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 12 2023Letter in response to petitioners' June 8, 2023 letter (No. 21-1596) filed by respondents Robinson, et al.
Main Document
Jun 12 2023Letter in response to petitioners' June 8, 2023 letter (No. 21-1596) filed by respondents Galmon, et al.
Main Document
Jun 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 22 2023Response Letter of Kyle Ardoin, et al. submitted.
Main Document
Jun 26 2023Writ of certiorari before judgment DISMISSED as improvidently granted. The stay heretofore entered by the Court on June 28, 2022, is vacated. This will allow the matter to proceed before the Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for review in the ordinary course and in advance of the 2024 congressional elections in Louisiana. See this Court's Rule 11.
Jul 28 2023Judgment issued.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth Baker MurrillOffice of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Kyle Ardoin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Galmon, et al.
Stuart Charles Naifeh
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
40 Rector St
5th Flr
New York, NY 10006

snaifeh@naacpldf.org
(917) 574-5846
Party name: Press Robinson, et al.