No. 21-1587 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tim Shoop, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Jeronique D. Cunningham
Docketed:June 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(11-3005, 20-3429)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 28, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2022 to August 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 17, 2022.
Jul 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael John Benza
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Michael J. Benza, Inc
17850 Geauga Lake Road
Chagrin Falls, OH 44023

michael.benza@case.edu
2163191247
Party name: Jeronique D. Cunningham
Other
Brett Robert Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

brett.nolan@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia