No. 21-1576
Title:Timothy J. Smith, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 21, 2022
Linked with 21A697
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12667)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 16, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2022Application (21A697) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 17, 2022 to June 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2022Application (21A697) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 16, 2022.
Jun 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 21, 2022 to August 22, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 22, 2022.
Jul 21 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Rutherford Institute, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 22, 2022 to September 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is furthet extended to and including September 21, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Samir Ibrahim Deger-Sen
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

samir.deger-sen@lw.com
(212) 906-4619
Party name: Timothy J. Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Michael Li-Ming Wong
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
555 Mission Street
Suite 3000
San Francisco, CA 94105

mwong@gibsondunn.com
415-393-8333
Party name: The Rutherford Institute, the Cato Institute, and the National Association for Public Defense