No. 21-1572
Title:Domino's Pizza, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Edmond Carmona
Docketed:June 17, 2022
Linked with 21A668
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55009)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2022Application (21A668) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2022 to June 15, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 02 2022Application (21A668) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 15, 2022.
Jun 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 18, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Courtney Gilligan Saleski
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP
1650 Market Street
Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

courtney.saleski@dlapiper.com
215-656-2431
Party name: Domino's Pizza LLC
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America