No. 21-1571
Title:Rozalyn Ragan, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Phillip Ragan, Deceased, Petitioner
v.
Melissa Ragan, aka Melissa Hudson
Docketed:June 17, 2022
Linked with 21A689
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(20CA0038)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 14, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2022Application (21A689) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2022 to July 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 05 2022Application (21A689) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until June 15, 2022.
Jun 01 2022Application (21A689) to extend further the time from June 15, 2022 to June 22, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestWritten Request
Jun 06 2022Application (21A689) denied by Justice Gorsuch.
Jun 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 09 2022Response Requested. (Due September 8, 2022)
Aug 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2022 to October 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Oct 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2022 to November 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 10, 2022.
Nov 10 2022Brief of respondent Melissa Ragan, aka Melissa Hudson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Reply of petitioner Rozalyn Ragan, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Phillip Ragan, Deceased filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Rozalyn Ragan, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Phillip Ragan, Deceased
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Melissa Ragan, aka Melissa Hudson
Kenneth H. GrayGasper Law Group, PLLC
128 S. Tejon, Suite 100
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

kgray@gasperlaw.com
719-227-7779
Party name: Melissa Ragan, aka Melissa Hudson