No. 21-1570
Title:Randall L. Spade, Petitioner
v.
Department of Justice
Docketed:June 16, 2022
Linked with 21A675
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1865)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2022Application (21A675) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2022 to June 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 05 2022Application (21A675) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 14, 2022.
Jun 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 18, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Randall L. Spade
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Justice