No. 21-1567
Title:Biogen International GmbH, et al., Petitioner
v.
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Docketed:June 15, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1933)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.