No. 21-1565
Title:State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees, et al., Petitioners
v.
I. Beverly Lake, et al.
Docketed:June 15, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(436PA13-4)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2022 to August 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2022, for all respondents.
Aug 11 2022Brief of respondents I. Beverly Lake, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 13 2022Reply of petitioners State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: State Health Plan for Teachers and State Employees, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Luther Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Gray, Layton, Kersh, Solomon, Furr & Smith, P.A.
516 South New Hope Road
Gastonia, NC 28054

mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com
(704) 790-6006
Party name: I. Beverly Lake, et al.