No. 21-1557 | |
Title: | Dayonta McClinton, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | June 14, 2022 |
Linked with 21A530 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-2860) |
Decision Date: | January 12, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 15 2022 | Application (21A530) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 12, 2022 to June 11, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Mar 22 2022 | Application (21A530) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until June 11, 2022. |
Jun 10 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 14, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 16 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Jun 30 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 08 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor Douglas Berman filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 14 2022 | Response Requested. (Due August 15, 2022) |
Jul 14 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 14 2022 | Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 10 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2022 to September 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 10 2022 | Brief amici curiae of 17 Former Federal Judges filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 11 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 14, 2022. |
Aug 15 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 14, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 07 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 14, 2022. |
Oct 11 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2022 to October 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 28, 2022. |
Oct 28 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 11 2022 | Reply of petitioner Dayonta McClinton filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 15 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022. |
Nov 29 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 05 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022. |
Dec 08 2022 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 14 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. |
Jan 03 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Jan 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023. |
Jan 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023. |
Jan 18 2023 | Letter of respondent United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
Jan 19 2023 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Dayonta McClinton filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 07 2023 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Dayonta McClinton filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 06 2023 | Letter of respondent United States filed. VIDED. |
Main Document | |
Apr 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. |
May 09 2023 | Rescheduled. |
May 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. |
May 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elie Salamon Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 250 West 55th Street New York, NY 10019-9710 elie.salamon@arnoldporter.com | 2128367360 |
Party name: Dayonta McClinton | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Keith Bradley Counsel of Record | Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP 1801 California Street, Suite 4900 Denver, CO 80202 keith.bradley@squirepb.com | 303-830-1776 |
Party name: Professor Douglas Berman | ||
Christopher D. Man Counsel of Record | Winston & Strawn LLP 1901 L Street NW Washington, DC 20036 cman@winston.com | 202-282-5622 |
Party name: 17 Former Federal Judges | ||
Shana-Tara O'Toole Counsel of Record | DUE PROCESS INSTITUTE 700 Pennsylvania Avenue SE #560 Washington, DC 20003 shana@idueprocess.org | 2025586683 |
Party name: Due Process Institute | ||
Michael David Pepson Counsel of Record | Americans for Prosperity Foundation 1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700 Arlington, VA 22201 mpepson@afphq.org | 5713294529 |
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation et al. | ||
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller Counsel of Record | O'Melveny & Myers 400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90071 jschneller@omm.com | 213-430-8115 |
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM | ||
Jay Remington Schweikert Counsel of Record | The Cato Institute 1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 jschweikert@cato.org | 2022161461 |
Party name: Cato Institute |