No. 21-1552
Title:Central Specialties, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Jonathan Large
Docketed:June 10, 2022
Linked with 21A520
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3027)
   Decision Date:November 24, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2022Application (21A520) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 11, 2022 to June 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Application (21A520) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until June 10, 2022.
Jun 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anna Aleksandrovna Bidwell
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Rd.
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

abidwell@ij.org
5124805936
Party name: Central Specialties, Inc.