No. 21-1550
Title:Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al.
Docketed:June 10, 2022
Linked with 21A662
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1330)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2022Application (21A662) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 9, 2022 to June 8, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Apr 29 2022Application (21A662) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until June 8, 2022.
May 26 2022Application (21A662) to extend further the time from June 8, 2022 to July 8, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Application (21A662) denied by Justice Gorsuch.
Jun 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2022 to August 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2022.
Jul 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation & DRI Center for Law and Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of the National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Brief of respondents Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 24 2022Reply of petitioners Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marco Benjamin Simons
    Counsel of Record
EarthRights International
1612 K Street N.W.
#800
Washington, DC 20006

marco@earthrights.org
202-466-5188
Party name: Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al.
Richard L. HerzEarthRights International
1612 K Street N.W.
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

rick@earthrights.org
860-233-4938
Party name: Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, et al.
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation & DRI Center for Law and Public Policy
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, 5th Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas, Utah, and Wyoming
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, N.W
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
2027838400
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
2001 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mark.perry@weil.com
202-682-7105
Party name: American Petroleum Institute