No. 21-1545
Title:Allen Whitaker, Petitioner
v.
District of Columbia Concealed Pistol Licensing Review Board
Docketed:June 9, 2022
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(20-AA-427)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Waiver of right of respondent D.C. Concealed Pistol Licensing Review Board to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Leslie Sue McAdoo Gordon
    Counsel of Record
McAdoo Gordon & Associates, P.C.
1629 K Street, N.W.
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

leslie.mcadoo@mcadoolaw.com
(202) 704-7388
Party name: Allen Whitaker
Attorneys for Respondent
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: D.C. Concealed Pistol Licensing Review Board