No. 21-1538
Title:Cleveland County, North Carolina, aka Cleveland County Emergency Medical Services, Petitioner
v.
Sara B. Conner, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated.
Docketed:June 8, 2022
Linked with 21A557
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2012)
   Decision Date:January 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2022Application (21A557) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 5, 2022 to June 3, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Application (21A557) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 3, 2022.
Jun 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2022Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Jul 26 2022Response Requested. (Due August 25, 2022)
Aug 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 25, 2022 to September 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 26, 2022.
Sep 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 26, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including October 28, 2022.
Oct 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2022 to November 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 4, 2022.
Nov 04 2022Brief of respondent Sara B. Connor in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2022Reply of Cleveland County, North Carolina not accepted for filing. (November 18, 2022 - to be corrected)
Nov 18 2022Reply of petitioner Cleveland County, North Carolina filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alexander C. Dale
    Counsel of Record
Ward and Smith, PA
127 Racine Drive
Wilmington, NC 28403

acd@wardandsmith.com
9107944806
Party name: Cleveland County, North Carolina
Attorneys for Respondent
Philip J. Gibbons Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibbons Law Group, PLLC
14045 Ballantyne Corporate Pl., Suite 325
Charlotte, NC 28277

phil@gibbonslg.com
704-612-0038
Party name: Sara B. Connor
Easha AnandStanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

eanand@stanford.edu
(650) 724-3345
Party name: Sara B. Conner
Other
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 15 Other States
Heidi Kristina Wilbur
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
1225 17th Street, Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

hwilbur@foxrothschild.com
3033837668
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association