No. 21-1535
Title:David Lowery, Petitioner
v.
Benjamin Joffe, et al.
Docketed:June 7, 2022
Linked with 21A519
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-15616)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 3, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2022Application (21A519) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 4, 2022 to June 3, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Application (21A519) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 3, 2022.
Jun 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 7, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 7, 2022 to August 22, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 22, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

tfrank@gmail.com
7032033848
Party name: David Lowery
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Michael Willen
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 497-7700
Party name: Google, Inc.