No. 21-1522
Title:Wayne Torcivia, Petitioner
v.
Suffolk County, New York, et al.
Docketed:June 3, 2022
Linked with 21A521
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4167)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2022Application (21A521) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 29, 2022 to May 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Application (21A521) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 31, 2022.
May 31 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2022Motion of Diana D’Anna, Kristen Steele, and Adeeb Yacoub, M.D. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Wayne Torcivia
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Diana D’Anna, Kristen Steele, and Adeeb Yacoub, M.D.