No. 21-152
Title:Estate of Madison Jody Jensen, by Her Personal Representative Jared Jensen, Petitioner
v.
Kennon Tubbs
Docketed:August 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4025)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Brief of respondent Kennon Tubbs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Reply of petitioner Estate of Madison Jody Jensen, ex rel. Jared Jensen filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave.
Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

arice@jonesday.com
(313) 733-3939
Party name: Estate of Madison Jody Jensen, ex rel. Jared Jensen
Attorneys for Respondent
Cortney Kochevar
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Naegle, PLLC
222 S. Main Street, Suite 1740
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

ckochevar@nelsonnaegle.com
385-292-4400
Party name: Kennon Tubbs