No. 21-1509
Title:Ryan Costello, Petitioners
v.
Carol Ann Carter, et al.
Docketed:June 1, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(7 MM 2022)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2022Motion of respondents Leigh M. Champman, et al. to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 15 2022Motion of respondents Carol A. Carter, et al. to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2022The motions of respondets to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Jul 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2022 to August 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2022, for all respondents.
Aug 16 2022Brief of respondents Pennsylvania Senator Jay Costa, Jr., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 16 2022Brief of respondents Leigh M. Chapman, Jessica Mathis, Tom Wolf in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2022Brief of respondents Carter Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 16 2022Letter of Philip T. Gressman, et al. submitted.
Main Document
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 26 2022Reply of petitioner Ryan Costello filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Ryan Costello
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Philip T. Gressman, et al.
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Carter Respondents
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(929) 294-2537
Party name: Leigh M. Chapman, Jessica Mathis, Tom Wolf
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Pennsylvania Senator Jay Costa, Jr. et al.