No. 21-1503 | |
Title: | Lloyds Banking Group plc, et al., Petitioners v. The Berkshire Bank, et al. |
Docketed: | June 1, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1987) |
Decision Date: | February 25, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 26 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 16 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent The Berkshire Bank, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Jul 06 2022 | Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2022) |
Jul 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2022 to September 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 1, 2022. |
Aug 23 2022 | Brief of respondents The Berkshire Bank, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Sep 07 2022 | Reply of petitioners Lloyds Banking Group plc, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice, Justice Kagan, and Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Paul Alessio Mezzina Counsel of Record | King & Spalding, LLP 1700 Pennsylvania Ave. NW Washington, DC 20006 pmezzina@kslaw.com | 202-737-0500 |
Party name: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc (n/k/a NatWest Group plc) | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jeremy Alan Lieberman Counsel of Record | Pomerantz LLP 600 Third Avenue, Floor 20 New York, NY 10016 jalieberman@pomlaw.com | 212-661-1100 |
Party name: The Berkshire Bank, et al. |