No. 21-1496
Title:Twitter, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mehier Taamneh, et al.
Docketed:May 31, 2022
Linked with 21A501
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17192)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 27, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2022Application (21A501) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 27, 2022 to May 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 14 2022Application (21A501) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 26, 2022.
May 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 30, 2022 to August 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Jun 27 2022Letter from counsel for respondent Google, LLC submitted pursuant to Rule 12.6 filed.
Main Document
Jun 29 2022Letter from counsel for respondent Facebook, Inc. submitted pursuant to Rule 12.6 filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2022Brief of respondents Mehier Taamneh, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2022Reply of petitioner Twitter, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Nov 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Mehier Taamneh, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 03 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits (including respondents in support) is extended to and including November 29, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2023.
Nov 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Twitter, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Google LLC
Blanket Consent
Nov 22 2022Letter amending corporate disclosure statement of Twitter, Inc. submitted.
Main Document
Nov 29 2022Brief of respondents Facebook, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2022Brief of petitioner Twitter, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Facebook, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Dec 05 2022Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern Carolina, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University, R Street Institute, and Reporters C filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of Brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association, Netchoice, Software & Information Industry Association, Developers Alliance, Chamber Of Progress, Internet Infrastructure Coalition, And Act The App Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Foreign Trade Council, United States Council for International Business, and Business Roundtable submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of Institute of International Bankers, European Banking Federation, The Bank Policy Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of Former State Department Legal Advisers submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of InterAction and Charity & Security Network submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Amicus brief of United States submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Twitter, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Google LLC
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Mehier Taamneh, et al.
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Other
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530

Cheri.Williams2@usdoj.gov
202-514-2201
Party name: United States
Marc J. Gottridge
    Counsel of Record
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

Marc.Gottridge@hsf.com
917-542-7600
Party name: Institute of International Bankers, European Banking Federation, The Bank Policy Institute
Timothy Paul Harkness
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

timothy.harkness@freshfields.com
212-277-4000
Party name: InterAction and Charity & Security Network
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2071
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern Carolina, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University, R Street Institute, and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lehotskykeller.com
5126938350
Party name: Brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association, Netchoice, Software & Information Industry Association, Developers Alliance, Chamber Of Progress, Internet Infrastructure Coalition, And Act The App Association
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Former State Department Legal Advisers
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Foreign Trade Council, United States Council for International Business, and Business Roundtable