No. 21-1492
Title:Anas Elhady, Petitioner
v.
Blake Bradley
Docketed:May 27, 2022
Linked with 21A607
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1339)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2022Application (21A607) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 25, 2022 to May 25, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Application (21A607) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until May 25, 2022.
May 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 27, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 27, 2022 to July 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 27, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Anas Elhady
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: united States