No. 21-1491
Title:City of Kent, Washington, Petitioner
v.
Adrian Jacobo-Hernandez
Docketed:May 27, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
   Case Numbers:(81783-3-I)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 2, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
May 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 27, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Adrian Jacobo-Hernandez to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bijan Thomas Hughes
    Counsel of Record
City of Kent - Office of the City Attorney
220 4th Ave S
Kent, WA 98032-5838

bhughes@kentwa.gov
2538565770
Party name: City of Kent
Attorneys for Respondent
John Robert Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1331 Broadway, Suite 400
Tacoma, WA 98402

john_carpenter@fd.org
2535936710
Party name: Adrian Jacobo-Hernandez